Texas 2023 - 88th 4th C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis November 8, 2023
Bill November 7, 2023
Bill November 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill November 10, 2023
Analysis November 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill November 9, 2023
Bill November 9, 2023

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill December 1, 2023
Bill December 1, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note November 15, 2023
Fiscal Note November 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill November 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis November 10, 2023
Analysis November 8, 2023