Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1588 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#777 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2105 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2101 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#777 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2022 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#701 | Journal Page: 2014 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2013 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2018 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1740 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 563 | |
House | 03/14/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 563 | |
House | 01/17/2025 | Filed |