Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1950 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2025
Fiscal Note January 17, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 23, 2025
Witness List April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 29, 2025
Fiscal Note April 29, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 22, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025