Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 7:21PM
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Education K-16