Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2198 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/07/2025

                            By: Bell of Kaufman (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 2198
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 28, 2025;
 April 29, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 34 in
 Kaufman County as the Officer Jacob Candanoza Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.249 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.249.  OFFICER JACOB CANDANOZA MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a) The portion of State Highway 34 in Kaufman County between its
 intersection with Kings Creek Drive and its intersection with North
 Frances Street is designated as the Officer Jacob Candanoza
 Memorial Highway. The designation is in addition to any other
 designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Officer Jacob Candanoza Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  It is the intention of the 89th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2025, that the provisions added by this Act be
 renumbered to prevent multiple provisions with the same
 designation.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *