Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2198 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2025
Fiscal Note January 29, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 8, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025
Bill April 8, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Bill April 25, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List May 7, 2025
Bill May 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2025
Bill April 8, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2025
Analysis April 8, 2025