Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB222 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/17/2025
SB2
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/03/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/24/2025 E Sent to the Governor
HB2
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:48PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
04/16/2025
SB2
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/03/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
HB2
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:48PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
04/16/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/03/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
SB2
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/03/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
HB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB2
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:48PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
03/18/2025 8:00 am
HB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on Major State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 S Received from the House
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House