Senate | 05/05/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1576 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2464 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#720 | Journal Page: 2056 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2056 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2056 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#720 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1932 | |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote | RV#609 | Journal Page: 1931 |
House | 04/28/2025 | Record vote RV#609 | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1361 | |
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 03/19/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 661 | |
House | 02/13/2025 | Filed |