Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2791 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 13, 2025
Fiscal Note February 13, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 10, 2025
Analysis April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Bill April 10, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 29, 2025
Fiscal Note April 29, 2025
Bill April 29, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 10, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note April 2, 2025
Fiscal Note March 24, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2025