Last Action: 04/02/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment as amended
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Passed to engrossment
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar