Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 5:47PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 8 2025 4:17PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/15/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule