Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 25, 2025
Analysis April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Bill April 25, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2025
Bill April 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2025
Analysis April 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note March 30, 2025