Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3096 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/07/2025

                            By: Cunningham (Senate Sponsor - Hall) H.B. No. 3096
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2025;
 May 1, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 7, 2025, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating March 17 as Profound Autism Awareness Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.089 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.089.  PROFOUND AUTISM AWARENESS DAY. (a)  March 17
 is Profound Autism Awareness Day to raise awareness about profound
 autism.  People with profound autism often require continuous care
 from an adult caregiver throughout their lives, may have severe
 intellectual disabilities, difficulty speaking, or an inability to
 speak, and are frequently excluded from research and support
 programs because of their unique needs.
 (b)  Profound Autism Awareness Day may be regularly observed
 by appropriate ceremonies and activities, including by showing
 support for those who experience profound autism and providing
 information regarding resources for people with profound autism and
 their caregivers.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *