Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3104 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 17, 2025
Fiscal Note April 4, 2025