Senate | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1706 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1652 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#1045 | Journal Page: 2360 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2360 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2360 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#904 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2232 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1740 | |
House | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 711 | |
House | 03/20/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 711 | |
House | 02/24/2025 | Filed |