Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3248 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2025
Analysis April 22, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 2, 2025
Fiscal Note March 28, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025