Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3846 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/23/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 9:12PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 9:12PM
04/23/2025 10:30 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 9:12PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 6:19PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 5 2025 9:12PM