Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4327 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/09/2025 8:00 am
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Left pending in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 1 2025 5:00PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/16/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Passed to engrossment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 1 2025 3:48PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H No action taken in committee
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:57PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted