Senate
|
05/08/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
04/23/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1432
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1579
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#225
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#209
|
Journal Page: 1407
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1407
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Record vote RV#209
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/15/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 971
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
House
|
02/28/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 353
|
House
|
11/12/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|