Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/07/2025

                            By: Thompson, et al. H.B. No. 451
 (Senate Sponsor - Paxton, et al.)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2025;
 April 23, 2025, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 7, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 7, 2025, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 451 By:  Perry




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a screening for the risk of commercial sexual
 exploitation of certain children.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 266.012(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Not later than the 45th day after the date a child enters
 the conservatorship of the department, the child shall receive:
 (1)  a developmentally appropriate comprehensive
 assessment that includes [.  The assessment must include]:
 (A) [(1)]  a screening for trauma; and
 (B) [(2)]  interviews with individuals who have
 knowledge of the child's needs; and
 (2)  a screening for risk of commercial sexual
 exploitation using a validated, evidenced-informed tool selected
 by the Child Sex Trafficking Prevention Unit established under
 Section 772.0062, Government Code, if:
 (A)  validation guidelines based on the child's
 age indicate the screening is appropriate; or
 (B)  concerns of commercial sexual exploitation
 exist.
 SECTION 2.  Section 221.003(b), Human Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A juvenile probation department must, before the
 disposition of a child's case and using a validated risk and needs
 assessment instrument or process provided or approved by the
 department, complete a risk and needs assessment for each child
 under the jurisdiction of the juvenile probation department.  The
 risk and needs assessment must include a screening for risk of
 commercial sexual exploitation using a validated,
 evidence-informed tool selected by the Child Sex Trafficking
 Prevention Unit established under Section 772.0062, Government
 Code.
 SECTION 3.  The Department of Family and Protective Services
 and the Texas Juvenile Justice Department are required to implement
 a provision of this Act only if the legislature appropriates money
 to the respective department specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the Department of Family and Protective Services and the
 Texas Juvenile Justice Department may, but are not required to,
 implement a provision of this Act using other money available for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *