Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB451 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 25, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis April 2, 2025
Bill April 2, 2025
Witness List April 2, 2025
Fiscal Note April 2, 2025

Engrossed

Analysis April 16, 2025
Fiscal Note April 16, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Fiscal Note May 7, 2025
Bill May 7, 2025
Witness List May 7, 2025
Analysis May 7, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2025
Fiscal Note April 28, 2025
Fiscal Note March 27, 2025
Fiscal Note March 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 7, 2025
Bill April 2, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 5, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis April 2, 2025