Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB4591 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/23/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:52PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
04/23/2025 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:52PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars