LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB4912
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB4912
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB4912
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/08/2025
8:00 am
Higher Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.036
HB42
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
HB125
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
HB1233
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
HB2853
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 1 2025 2:57PM
HB3148
Introduced
Last Action: 04/08/2025 H Left pending in committee
HB3326
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 1:47PM
HB3701
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB4066
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB4361
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4762
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4909
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB4912
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars