Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar