House | 05/10/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 03/13/2025 | Filed |