LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
House
Bills
HB573
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB573
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas House Bill HB573
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/03/2025
10:30 am
Environmental Regulation Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB573
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1499
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB1768
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3071
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
HB3249
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3866
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4112
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars