Senate | 04/29/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1509 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/25/2025 | Record vote | RV#571 | Journal Page: 1885 |
House | 04/25/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1885 | |
House | 04/25/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1885 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1796 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote | RV#523 | Journal Page: 1803 |
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1795 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Record vote RV#523 | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1795 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1539 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 03/05/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 11/12/2024 | Filed |