Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HB745 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 26, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

House Committee Report

Witness List April 15, 2025
Analysis April 15, 2025
Fiscal Note April 15, 2025
Bill April 15, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 15, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 15, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 4, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025