House | 05/02/2025 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2754 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 04/16/2025 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 1269 | |
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1024 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1068 | |
House | 04/09/2025 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Referred to Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/25/2025 | Filed |