7 | 8 | | WHEREAS, July 4, 2026, will mark the 250th anniversary of the |
---|
8 | 9 | | adoption of the American Declaration of Independence by the Second |
---|
9 | 10 | | Continental Congress, which was convened in Philadelphia in 1776; |
---|
10 | 11 | | and |
---|
11 | 12 | | WHEREAS, Beginning in the 1760s, Great Britain's taxation and |
---|
12 | 13 | | frontier policies became increasingly onerous to residents of its |
---|
13 | 14 | | 13 North American colonies; their vigorous protests were met with |
---|
14 | 15 | | declaration of martial law in Massachusetts and the closing of the |
---|
15 | 16 | | port of Boston; delegates from colonial governments met in a |
---|
16 | 17 | | Continental Congress to organize a boycott of British goods; as |
---|
17 | 18 | | fighting broke out between colonists and British troops in |
---|
18 | 19 | | Massachusetts, the Continental Congress coordinated resistance |
---|
19 | 20 | | efforts; and |
---|
20 | 21 | | WHEREAS, The prospect of reconciliation with Britain grew |
---|
21 | 22 | | increasingly unlikely; on December 22, 1775, the British Parliament |
---|
22 | 23 | | prohibited trade with the colonies, and the Continental Congress |
---|
23 | 24 | | responded the following April by opening colonial ports; Thomas |
---|
24 | 25 | | Paine championed the cause of independence in a widely-distributed |
---|
25 | 26 | | pamphlet, Common Sense, and on June 7, 1776, Richard Henry Lee |
---|
26 | 27 | | introduced a motion in the Continental Congress to declare |
---|
27 | 28 | | independence; although not all members were ready to make this |
---|
28 | 29 | | break, the Continental Congress formed a committee to write such a |
---|
29 | 30 | | declaration, composed of five delegates: Thomas Jefferson, John |
---|
30 | 31 | | Adams, Roger Sherman, Robert Livingston, and Benjamin Franklin; and |
---|
31 | 32 | | WHEREAS, Mr. Jefferson, a junior delegate from Virginia, was |
---|
32 | 33 | | assigned to write the initial draft; drawing on George Mason's |
---|
33 | 34 | | Virginia Declaration of Rights, as well as Mr. Jefferson's own |
---|
34 | 35 | | drafts of the Virginia Constitution and Summary View of the Rights |
---|
35 | 36 | | of British Americans, Mr. Jefferson produced a rough draft in a |
---|
36 | 37 | | matter of days; Mr. Adams and Mr. Franklin made revisions, followed |
---|
37 | 38 | | by the full committee, which then presented the final version to the |
---|
38 | 39 | | full Continental Congress on June 28; and |
---|
39 | 40 | | WHEREAS, After voting for independence on July 2, 1776, the |
---|
40 | 41 | | Continental Congress made 39 additional revisions to the committee |
---|
41 | 42 | | draft; on the morning of July 4, the Declaration of Independence was |
---|
42 | 43 | | adopted, a defining moment in the American Revolution; and |
---|
43 | 44 | | WHEREAS, The Declaration of Independence consists of 27 |
---|
44 | 45 | | grievances against England's King George III in which the colonists |
---|
45 | 46 | | outline the complaints that "impel them to the separation" from the |
---|
46 | 47 | | "mother country"; among the most familiar and enduring protests has |
---|
47 | 48 | | been against the oft-repeated "taxation without representation"--a |
---|
48 | 49 | | refrain that continues in use today in various contexts; and |
---|
49 | 50 | | WHEREAS, Additionally, the Declaration of Independence |
---|
50 | 51 | | asserts "Laws of Nature and of Nature's God" to which a people are |
---|
51 | 52 | | "entitle[d]," including the belief that "all men are created equal, |
---|
52 | 53 | | that they are endowed by their Creator with certain unalienable |
---|
53 | 54 | | Rights, that among these are Life, Liberty and the pursuit of |
---|
54 | 55 | | Happiness"; and |
---|
55 | 56 | | WHEREAS, The Declaration of Independence provided a firm and |
---|
56 | 57 | | enduring foundation for our liberty, and over the course of nearly |
---|
57 | 58 | | two and a half centuries, this pivotal document has been a source of |
---|
58 | 59 | | inspiration to people the world over; now, therefore, be it |
---|
59 | 60 | | RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
60 | 61 | | hereby commemorate the 250th anniversary of the adoption of the |
---|
61 | 62 | | Declaration of Independence, which founded the United States of |
---|
62 | 63 | | America on July 4, 1776. |
---|