Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR123 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 123




 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, July 4, 2026, will mark the 250th anniversary of the
 adoption of the American Declaration of Independence by the Second
 Continental Congress, which was convened in Philadelphia in 1776;
 and
 WHEREAS, Beginning in the 1760s, Great Britain's taxation and
 frontier policies became increasingly onerous to residents of its
 13 North American colonies; their vigorous protests were met with
 declaration of martial law in Massachusetts and the closing of the
 port of Boston; delegates from colonial governments met in a
 Continental Congress to organize a boycott of British goods; as
 fighting broke out between colonists and British troops in
 Massachusetts, the Continental Congress coordinated resistance
 efforts; and
 WHEREAS, The prospect of reconciliation with Britain grew
 increasingly unlikely; on December 22, 1775, the British Parliament
 prohibited trade with the colonies, and the Continental Congress
 responded the following April by opening colonial ports; Thomas
 Paine championed the cause of independence in a widely-distributed
 pamphlet, Common Sense, and on June 7, 1776, Richard Henry Lee
 introduced a motion in the Continental Congress to declare
 independence; although not all members were ready to make this
 break, the Continental Congress formed a committee to write such a
 declaration, composed of five delegates: Thomas Jefferson, John
 Adams, Roger Sherman, Robert Livingston, and Benjamin Franklin; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Jefferson, a junior delegate from Virginia, was
 assigned to write the initial draft; drawing on George Mason's
 Virginia Declaration of Rights, as well as Mr. Jefferson's own
 drafts of the Virginia Constitution and Summary View of the Rights
 of British Americans, Mr. Jefferson produced a rough draft in a
 matter of days; Mr. Adams and Mr. Franklin made revisions, followed
 by the full committee, which then presented the final version to the
 full Continental Congress on June 28; and
 WHEREAS, After voting for independence on July 2, 1776, the
 Continental Congress made 39 additional revisions to the committee
 draft; on the morning of July 4, the Declaration of Independence was
 adopted, a defining moment in the American Revolution; and
 WHEREAS, The Declaration of Independence consists of 27
 grievances against England's King George III in which the colonists
 outline the complaints that "impel them to the separation" from the
 "mother country"; among the most familiar and enduring protests has
 been against the oft-repeated "taxation without representation"--a
 refrain that continues in use today in various contexts; and
 WHEREAS, Additionally, the Declaration of Independence
 asserts "Laws of Nature and of Nature's God" to which a people are
 "entitle[d]," including the belief that "all men are created equal,
 that they are endowed by their Creator with certain unalienable
 Rights, that among these are Life, Liberty and the pursuit of
 Happiness"; and
 WHEREAS, The Declaration of Independence provided a firm and
 enduring foundation for our liberty, and over the course of nearly
 two and a half centuries, this pivotal document has been a source of
 inspiration to people the world over; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby commemorate the 250th anniversary of the adoption of the
 Declaration of Independence, which founded the United States of
 America on July 4, 1776.
 Lowe
 Swanson
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 123 was adopted by the House on
 April 9, 2025, by a non-record vote.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 123 was adopted by the Senate on
 April 15, 2025, by a viva-voce vote.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor