Senate | 05/05/2025 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2754 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2755 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 2644 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1701 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1701 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1701 | |
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/01/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1554 | |
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1350 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1362 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Record vote | RV#166 | Journal Page: 1362 |
House | 04/14/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1362 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Record vote RV#166 | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1361 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1042 | |
House | 04/03/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Referred to s/c on Academic & Career-Oriented Education by chair | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 417 | |
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |