Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR64 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2025
Bill February 5, 2025

House Committee Report

Witness List April 7, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill April 7, 2025