E | 04/22/2025 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1740 | |
E | 04/10/2025 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1381 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1079 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1061 | |
House | 04/08/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1090 | |
House | 04/07/2025 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Read & adopted | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 812 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Adopted | Journal Page: 839 | |
House | 03/31/2025 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 839 | |
House | 03/28/2025 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Referred to Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Filed |