Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas House Bill HCR65 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 04/08/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.C.R. No. 65




 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, The city of Longview lost a beloved resident with
 the passing of Tracy Lee Vincent on July 30, 2024, at the age of 66;
 and
 WHEREAS, The son of Helen Hazel and James Thomas Vincent,
 Tracy Vincent was born in Jacksonville on January 12, 1958, and he
 grew up with the companionship of two brothers, Tommy and Harvey; he
 graduated from Jacksonville High School in 1977; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Vincent relocated to Tyler in 1985 and
 subsequently embarked on a fulfilling career in
 telecommunications; while there, he was a dedicated member of Rose
 Heights Church; after moving to Longview in 1995, he became highly
 active in his community, giving generously of his time and talents
 to a number of organizations, including as a member of the Longview
 Chamber of Commerce and as chair of the Republican Party of Gregg
 County from 2017 to 2019; moreover, he previously served as a
 Republican precinct chair as well as a delegate to the Republican
 National Convention, and he was involved in a number of other
 political groups, such as the East Texans for Liberty Political
 Action Committee and We The People-Longview; and
 WHEREAS, In all his endeavors, Mr. Vincent benefited from the
 love and support of his wife, Donna, and he was the proud father of
 seven children, Brandi, Justin, Melissa, Christopher, Melissa,
 Stephanie, and Korbin; over the years, he was further blessed with
 15 grandchildren and a great-grandchild; in his leisure time, he
 enjoyed hunting and fishing, and he was also known for his
 entertaining campfire stories and spontaneous pranks; a man of
 strong faith, he and his wife were members of Mobberly Baptist
 Church; and
 WHEREAS, While the death of Tracy Vincent brings great
 sadness to his family and friends, he leaves behind a legacy that
 will long be treasured by all those who held him dear; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the 89th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby pay tribute to the life of Tracy Lee Vincent and extend
 sincere condolences to his loved ones; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives and Senate adjourn this day, they do so in memory of
 Tracy Vincent.
 Dean
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 65 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the House on March 31, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.C.R. No. 65 was unanimously adopted by a
 rising vote of the Senate on April 7, 2025.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor