Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/02/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2732 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Record vote | RV#1349 | Journal Page: 2731 |
House | 05/02/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2577 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Record vote | RV#1214 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2576 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2576 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3756 | Journal Page: 2576 |
House | 05/01/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1589 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1377 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1088 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 426 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 426 | |
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |