Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2025
Analysis February 18, 2025
Fiscal Note February 18, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis May 1, 2025
Bill May 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 31, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2025

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2025
Analysis March 14, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 1, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 16, 2025