Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1378 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/05/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            S.B. No. 1378




 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of certain nonresident seller's permit
 holders who also hold a winery permit.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 37.07, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 37.07.  PROHIBITED ACTIVITIES.  (a) No holder of a
 nonresident seller's permit, nor any officer, director, agent, or
 employee of the holder, nor any affiliate of the holder, regardless
 of whether the affiliation is corporate or by management,
 direction, or control, may do any of the following:
 (1)  hold or have an interest in the permit, business,
 assets, or corporate stock of a person authorized to import liquor
 into this state for the purpose of resale unless:
 (A)  the interest was acquired on or before
 January 1, 1941;
 (B)  [, or unless] the permittee is a Texas
 corporation holding a manufacturer's license and a brewer's permit
 issued before April 1, 1971; or
 (C)  the permittee holds a winery permit that was
 first issued on or before May 1, 2010, for a winery whose premises
 is located in a municipality:
 (i)  with a population of more than 130,000
 and less than 150,000; and
 (ii)  located in three counties, one of
 which has a population of more than two million and less than three
 million;
 (2)  fail to make or file a report with the commission
 as required by a rule of the commission;
 (3)  sell liquor for resale inside this state that
 fails to meet the standards of quality, purity, and identity
 prescribed by the commission;
 (4)  advertise any liquor contrary to the laws of this
 state or to the rules of the commission, or sell liquor for resale
 in this state in violation of advertising or labeling rules of the
 commission;
 (5)  sell liquor for resale inside this state or cause
 it to be brought into the state in a size of container prohibited by
 this code or by rule of the commission;
 (6)  solicit or take orders for liquor from a person not
 authorized to import liquor into this state for the purpose of
 resale;
 (7)  induce, persuade, or influence, or attempt to
 induce, persuade, or influence, a person to violate this code or a
 rule of the commission, or conspire with a person to violate this
 code or a rule of the commission; or
 (8)  exercise a privilege granted by a nonresident
 seller's permit while an order or suspension against the permit is
 in effect.
 (b)  The holder of a nonresident seller's permit who holds a
 winery permit or whose affiliate holds a winery permit may not sell
 wine to the holder of the winery permit.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1378 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2025, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1378 passed the House on
 May 2, 2025, by the following vote:  Yeas 99, Nays 20, one present
 not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor