|
05/07/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2025
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#959
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote RV#959
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#935
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
1-Cortez
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1088
|
House
|
04/02/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 833
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 832
|
Senate
|
04/01/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
Journal Page: 457
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 457
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|