Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2025
Analysis February 25, 2025
Bill February 25, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 1, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 26, 2025
Witness List March 26, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025

Enrolled

Fiscal Note May 5, 2025
Bill May 5, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 23, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 23, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025