LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB1619
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB1619
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB1619
Compare Versions
SB1619 Enrolled May 5, 2025
SB1619 Comm Sub April 23, 2025
SB1619 House Committee Report April 23, 2025
SB1619 Engrossed April 1, 2025
SB1619 Comm Sub March 26, 2025
SB1619 Senate Committee Report March 26, 2025
SB1619 Introduced February 25, 2025
Version 1 (Old)
SB1619 Enrolled May 5, 2025
SB1619 Comm Sub April 23, 2025
SB1619 House Committee Report April 23, 2025
SB1619 Engrossed April 1, 2025
SB1619 Comm Sub March 26, 2025
SB1619 Senate Committee Report March 26, 2025
SB1619 Introduced February 25, 2025
Version 2 (New)
Compare