Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2280 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#947 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2201 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#865 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2200 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote RV#865 | ||
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2194 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 2679 | Journal Page: 2194 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency | Journal Page: 1638 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1097 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1041 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1040 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |