Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1706 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2025
Analysis February 27, 2025
Fiscal Note February 27, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 2, 2025
Bill April 2, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis March 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill April 2, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 26, 2025