Senate | 05/05/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Passed as amended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Amended | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Amendment(s) offered | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1308 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Referred to Border Security | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 701 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |