Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2201 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 04/15/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Birdwell, Blanco S.B. No. 2201
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2025; March 25, 2025, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Border Security;
 April 15, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1; April 15, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 2201 By:  Birdwell




 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to intelligence databases for combinations, criminal
 street gangs, and foreign terrorist organizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 67.053, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsection (b-1) and amending Subsection (c) to
 read as follows:
 (b-1)  The department shall develop and make available a
 minimum training course for access to and use of the intelligence
 database established by the department under Article 67.052.
 Before a person may access and use the intelligence database, the
 person must complete the minimum training course described by this
 subsection.
 (c)  The department shall adopt rules necessary to implement
 this article, including the content of the training course required
 by Subsection (b-1).
 SECTION 2.  Article 67.054, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  Criminal information collected under this chapter
 relating to a criminal street gang or foreign terrorist
 organization must:
 (1)  be relevant to the identification of an
 organization that is reasonably suspected of involvement in
 criminal activity; and
 (2)  consist of:
 (A)  a judgment under any law that includes, as a
 finding or as an element of a criminal offense, participation in a
 criminal street gang or foreign terrorist organization;
 (B)  a self-admission, which may be implied or
 demonstrated, by an individual of membership in a criminal street
 gang or foreign terrorist organization, including the use of the
 Internet or other electronic format or medium to post photographs
 or other documentation identifying the individual as a member of a
 criminal street gang or foreign terrorist organization [that is
 made during a judicial proceeding]; or
 (C)  [except as provided by Subsection (c),] any
 two of the following:
 (i)  [a self-admission by the individual of
 membership in a criminal street gang or foreign terrorist
 organization that is not made during a judicial proceeding,
 including the use of the Internet or other electronic format or
 medium to post photographs or other documentation identifying the
 individual as a member of a criminal street gang or foreign
 terrorist organization;
 [(ii)]  an identification of the individual
 as a member of a criminal street gang or foreign terrorist
 organization by a documented criminal street gang member or foreign
 terrorist organization member or a family member [reliable
 informant or other individual;
 [(iii)  a corroborated identification of the
 individual as a member of a criminal street gang or foreign
 terrorist organization by an informant or other individual of
 unknown reliability];
 (ii) [(iv)]  evidence that the individual
 frequents or is located at a previously documented area of a
 criminal street gang or foreign terrorist organization, including
 physical, digital, or online locations [and associates with known
 members of a criminal street gang or foreign terrorist
 organization];
 (iii) [(v)]  evidence that the individual
 uses, in more than an incidental manner, criminal street gang or
 foreign terrorist organization dress, hand signals, tattoos, or
 symbols, including expressions of letters, numbers, words, or
 marks, regardless of how or the means by which the symbols are
 displayed, that are associated with a criminal street gang or
 foreign terrorist organization [that operates in an area frequented
 by the individual and described by Subparagraph (iv)];
 (iv) [(vi)]  evidence that the individual
 has been arrested or taken into custody [with known members of a
 criminal street gang or foreign terrorist organization] for an
 offense or conduct consistent with gang activity as defined by
 Section 125.061, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, with:
 (a)  known members of a criminal street
 gang or foreign terrorist organization; or
 (b)  individuals who use, in more than
 an incidental manner, criminal street gang or foreign terrorist
 organization dress, hand signals, tattoos, or symbols, including
 expressions of letters, numbers, words, or marks, regardless of how
 or the means by which the symbols are displayed, that are associated
 with a criminal street gang or foreign terrorist organization;
 (v) [(vii)]  evidence that the individual
 communicates, whether in person, in writing, or electronically,
 with [has visited] a known member of a criminal street gang or
 foreign terrorist organization[, other than a family member of the
 individual,] while the member is confined in or committed to a penal
 institution; or
 (vi) [(viii)]  evidence of the individual's
 use of technology, including the Internet and social media, to
 advertise the criminal street gang or foreign terrorist
 organization or recruit new members of a criminal street gang or
 foreign terrorist organization.
 (b-1)  If a law enforcement officer has reasonable suspicion
 that an individual is associated with a criminal street gang or
 foreign terrorist organization as a result of meeting the criteria
 to be included in the intelligence database, the officer's name and
 department must be included in the database with the individual's
 submitted information.
 SECTION 3.  Article 67.151(b), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Information that is [Subject to Subsection (c),
 information] collected about an individual under this chapter and
 that relates [relating] to a criminal street gang must be removed
 after five years from an intelligence database established under
 Article 67.051 and the intelligence database maintained by the
 department under Article 67.052 unless [if:
 [(1)]  the information continues to meet the submission
 criteria under Article 67.054 to be included in those intelligence
 databases [relates to the investigation or prosecution of criminal
 activity engaged in by an individual other than a child; and
 [(2)  the individual who is the subject of the
 information has not been arrested for criminal activity reported to
 the department under Chapter 66].
 SECTION 4.  Article 67.152(b), Code of Criminal Procedure,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Information that is [Subject to Subsection (c),
 information] collected about a child under this chapter and that
 relates [relating] to a criminal street gang must be removed after
 two years from an intelligence database established under Article
 67.051 and the intelligence database maintained by the department
 under Article 67.052 unless [if:
 [(1)]  the information continues to meet the submission
 criteria under Article 67.054 to be included in those intelligence
 databases [relates to the investigation or prosecution of criminal
 activity engaged in by a child; and
 [(2)  the child who is the subject of the information
 has not been:
 [(A)  arrested for criminal activity reported to
 the department under Chapter 66; or
 [(B)  taken into custody for delinquent conduct
 reported to the department under Chapter 58, Family Code].
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter D, Chapter 67, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Article 67.153 to read as follows:
 Art. 67.153.  AUDIT. The state auditor annually shall
 conduct an audit of information that is held in the department's
 intelligence database maintained under Article 67.052.
 SECTION 6.  The following provisions of the Code of Criminal
 Procedure are repealed:
 (1)  Article 67.054(c);
 (2)  Article 67.151(c); and
 (3)  Article 67.152(c).
 SECTION 7.  (a) The Department of Public Safety shall
 develop and make available the minimum training course required by
 Article 67.053(b-1), Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by this
 Act, not later than January 1, 2026.
 (b)  A person who begins accessing the intelligence database
 maintained under Chapter 67, Code of Criminal Procedure, before
 January 1, 2026, is not required to take the minimum training course
 described by Article 67.053(b-1), Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 added by this Act, before January 1, 2027.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *