Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB24 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 5, 2025
Analysis March 5, 2025
Bill March 5, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note March 26, 2025
Bill March 26, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 17, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025
Witness List March 17, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 10, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 17, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2025
Analysis March 10, 2025