Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB24 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Campbell, et al. S.B. No. 24
2-
3-
2+ (In the Senate - Filed March 5, 2025; March 6, 2025, read
3+ first time and referred to Committee on Education K-16;
4+ March 17, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0; March 17, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 24 By: Bettencourt
49
510
611 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
712 AN ACT
813 relating to the inclusion of an understanding of communist regimes
914 and ideologies in the essential knowledge and skills for the social
1015 studies curriculum for certain public school students.
1116 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1217 SECTION 1. Section 28.002, Education Code, is amended by
1318 adding Subsections (h-11) and (h-12) to read as follows:
1419 (h-11) In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for
1520 the social studies curriculum for each grade level from grade 4
1621 through grade 12, the State Board of Education shall, as
1722 appropriate, adopt essential knowledge and skills that develop each
1823 student's understanding of communist regimes and ideologies and
1924 include age appropriate and developmentally appropriate
2025 instruction with information on:
2126 (1) the history of and tactics used by communist
2227 movements in the United States;
2328 (2) historical events and atrocities attributable to
2429 communist regimes, including:
2530 (A) the Cultural Revolution and the Great Leap
2631 Forward;
2732 (B) the Holodomor, otherwise known as the
2833 Ukrainian Famine;
2934 (C) the Soviet-era political purge known as the
3035 Great Terror;
3136 (D) the Cambodian genocide under Pol Pot and the
3237 Khmer Rouge;
3338 (E) the origins and policies of the Communist
3439 Party of Cuba;
3540 (F) communist guerrilla movements in Latin
3641 America; and
3742 (G) the oppression and suffering experienced by
3843 people living under communist regimes, including mass murder,
3944 violent land seizures, show trials, concentration camps, forced
4045 labor, poverty, and general economic deterioration;
4146 (3) a comparative analysis of:
4247 (A) the ideologies of communism and
4348 totalitarianism contrasted with the United States' founding
4449 principles of freedom and democracy; and
4550 (B) collectivist ideologies contrasted with the
4651 United States' founding principles of individual rights,
4752 merit-based advancement, and free enterprise;
4853 (4) modern threats to the United States and its allies
4954 posed by communist regimes and ideologies;
5055 (5) common economic, industrial, and political events
5156 that historically precede communist revolutions;
5257 (6) the evolution of communist ideologies from
5358 economic, class-based theories into broader cultural movements
5459 that divide societies and maintain collective control over
5560 individual rights;
5661 (7) common historical and modern methods used to
5762 spread communist ideologies, including:
5863 (A) propaganda;
5964 (B) public shaming tactics;
6065 (C) censorship; and
6166 (D) forced conformity; and
6267 (8) first-person accounts, in the form of in-person,
6368 video-recorded, or written testimony, from the victims of communist
6469 regimes.
6570 (h-12) In adopting the essential knowledge and skills
6671 required under Subsection (h-11), the State Board of Education:
6772 (1) shall adopt and publish standards for the required
6873 instruction;
6974 (2) shall seek input from:
7075 (A) victims of communism willing to share their
7176 first-person accounts; and
7277 (B) nationally recognized organizations
7378 dedicated to commemorating victims of communism; and
7479 (3) may incorporate material from existing
7580 educational programs that provide instruction on the topic of
7681 communist regimes and ideologies, if the material meets the
7782 standards adopted by the State Board of Education under Subdivision
7883 (1).
7984 SECTION 2. This Act applies beginning with the 2026-2027
8085 school year.
8186 SECTION 3. Not later than July 31, 2026, the State Board of
8287 Education shall review and revise, as needed, the essential
8388 knowledge and skills of the social studies curriculum as required
8489 by Section 28.002(h-11), Education Code, as added by this Act.
8590 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
8691 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
8792 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
8893 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
8994 Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
95+ * * * * *