House
|
04/30/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2025
|
Public hearing continued on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
House
|
03/26/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
House
|
03/20/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 744
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 640
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Statement(s) submitted
|
|
Journal Page: 608
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 607
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 607
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 606
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Eckhardt
|
Journal Page: 604
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Eckhardt
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 603
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 601
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/17/2025
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 542
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 365
|
Senate
|
02/25/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 327
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 299
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|