Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2025
Analysis February 20, 2025
Fiscal Note February 20, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note March 19, 2025
Bill March 19, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 13, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025
Bill March 13, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 2, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2025
Analysis February 28, 2025