Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to s/c on Juvenile Justice by Speaker: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee